ROYSTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1171548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download