THE GREATNESS OF THE ETERNAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1172262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 268 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 April 2019 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 April 2019 69 days late Download