YARMOUTH GREYHOUND HOMEFINDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To find retirement homes for racing greyhounds attached to Yarmouth Stadium.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN WOODROW | Chair | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Justin Franklin | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Guise | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.91k | £108.24k | £130.83k | £111.79k | £247.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.47k | £94.80k | £152.66k | £140.21k | £191.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF GREYHOUNDS, MAINLY IN THE AREAS OF NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND PROTECT SUCH DOGS FROM CRUELTY, BY PROVIDING TEMPORARY SHELTER FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DOGS AND PLACING GREYHOUNDS IN SUITABLE PERMANENT HOMES FOR THOSE GREYHOUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yarmouth Stadium
Yarmouth Road
Caister-On-Sea
GREAT YARMOUTH
Norfolk
NR30 5TE
- Phone:
- 01508499064
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window