SUCCESS STORIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Success Stories was set up to advance and relieve the needs of disadvantaged children and parents through the provision of educational, recreational & leisure programmes provided in the interest of social & academic needs and welfare, designed to improve their circumstances of life. The charity is also known as " Chayim Shel Torah " which is also part of the activities of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 June 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PINCHOS ENGLANDER | Chair | 04 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||
AARON HOFFMAN | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||
David Spitzer | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.63k | £946.79k | £726.18k | £746.40k | £480.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.88k | £652.92k | £1.07m | £751.55k | £378.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £264.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £946.79k | £726.18k | £746.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £652.92k | £1.07m | £751.55k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.80k | £1.80k | £1.80k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £538.06k | £902.90k | £647.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (ÆTHE OBJECTSÆ) ARE: Ò FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AROUND THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS; OR BY GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORLDWIDE THAT PROVIDE EDUCATION. Ò THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 LEWESTON PLACE
LONDON
N16 6RH
- Phone:
- 07534011985
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window