Financial history THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF HOLY ANARGYRI TRUST

Charity number: 1173969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £25.79k £28.09k £22.49k £18.33k £30.05k
Total expenditure £13.90k £36.70k £20.68k £18.14k £26.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A