LIFE SKILLS EDUCATION CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Life Skills Education Charity develop and deliver DAaRT (Drug, Alcohol and Resilience Training) resources in schools. Our programmes are independently evaluated and proven to work, put together using evidence from research and follow government guidelines and best practice. Our team of trained facilitators deliver our programmes to over 13,000 young people in over 300 schools each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 21 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Thomas Glover-Cooke | Chair | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth McIntyre | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Phillips | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Wheatley | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Subhash Desai | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Reginald Cox | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Ayoola | Trustee | 23 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £499.78k | £554.40k | £415.63k | £311.95k | £287.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.62k | £508.57k | £457.27k | £379.71k | £288.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £135.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £419.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £500.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £7.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £9.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 DEC 1899 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 APR 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 9 TO 16 THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES WHO ARE VULNERABLE TO BECOMING ADDICTED TO OR DEPENDENT UPON DRUGS, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND RAISING AWARENESS THROUGH EVIDENCED BASED LIFE SKILLS EDUCATION PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Life Skills Education Centre
6 Sherwood Rise
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 6JF
- Phone:
- 03001113273
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window