BOOMERANG CARDIFF

Charity number: 1172898
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 March 2021 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 March 2021 144 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download