ZUMUNTA COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1172650
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 August 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 August 2020 195 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 April 2019 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 April 2019 79 days late Download