THE BRANCH (BEECHES ROAD AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES HOUSE)

Charity number: 509725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £107.13k £96.00k £117.16k £139.29k £13.98m
Total expenditure £99.58k £92.00k £101.54k £124.13k £13.23m
Income from government contracts £46.37k £44.00k N/A N/A £4.49m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £45.26k £72.77k £45.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £44.91k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £94.90k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.23m
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0