Financial history PROJECT H.A.L.O. (HELP AND AID FOR LESS OPPORTUNED)

Charity number: 1172207
Charity reporting is overdue by 56 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £1.00k £9.82k £26.10k £38.70k £51.00k
Total expenditure £360 £4.45k £21.46k £39.45k £51.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A