Accounts and annual returns AFROCATS

Charity number: 1173334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 June 2022 06 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2022 06 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2020 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2020 15 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2019 13 June 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2019 13 June 2020 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window