ARBOURTHORNE AND DISTRICT RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509735
Charity reporting is overdue by 1425 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 695 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 695 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1060 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1060 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1425 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1425 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 June 2018 512 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required