ARBOURTHORNE AND DISTRICT RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509735
Charity reporting is overdue by 1420 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2008 31/12/2013 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £14.87k £17.21k £17.64k £27.72k £17.47k
Total expenditure £10.65k £32.23k £17.75k £26.60k £17.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0