AGAR NOOK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1172829
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 March 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 15 March 2021 15 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 14 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 14 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 14 July 2019 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 14 July 2019 136 days late Download