Financial history LACEY GREEN COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509751
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £11.05k £12.73k £11.19k £3.06k £13.76k
Total expenditure £745 £24.02k £18.35k £6.12k £7.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A