Financial history LITTLE ASTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £103.66k £86.22k £55.85k £7.28k £8.27k
Total expenditure £107.47k £84.02k £57.20k £7.15k £9.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A