Accounts and annual returns NEW MIND INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1173300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 June 2019 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window