THE LIVING WORD BAPTIST TEMPLE

Charity number: 1173920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 11 October 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 12 October 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 17 January 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required