LORDSWOOD RESIDENTS AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run the Lordswood Community Centre, Sandpiper Road, Lordswood, Southampton, SO16 8FD for the benefit of the community in and near Lordswood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southampton City
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Renyard | Chair | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kay Broomfield | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Patrica Waller | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Davis | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Merengnage Nalin De Costa | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES MORRISON | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.61k | £32.65k | £26.33k | £28.52k | £30.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.05k | £10.59k | £13.69k | £18.29k | £17.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.89k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: 1) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LORDSWOOD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE WOODLAND OF LORDS WOOD TO THE NORTH AND WEST, COXFORD ROAD TO THE EAST AND LORDSHILL WAY TO THE SOUTH WITH THE ENCOMPASSMENT OF BEAULIEU CLOSE, PETWORTH GARDENS, COWDRAY CLOSE AND LONGLEAT GARDENS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lordswood Community Centre
Sandpiper Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 8FD
- Phone:
- 07719741300
- Email:
- lordswoodccso16@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window