Accounts and annual returns THE CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY (SHREWSBURY DIOCESE) INC

Charity number: 509793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window