Accounts and annual returns THE CHESWARDINE CHARITY (2017)

Charity number: 1172514
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window