Financial history THE CHESWARDINE CHARITY (2017)

Charity number: 1172514
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £27 £80 £74 £8 £6
Total expenditure £0 £300 £3.75k £575 £475
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A