London Performing Academy of Music c.i.o

Charity number: 1173667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 March 2021 251 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 March 2021 251 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download