CANVEY ISLAND U3A

Charity number: 1173536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CANVEY ISLAND U3A IS A SELF-HELP, SELF-MANAGED LIFELONG LEARNING CO-OPERATIVE FOR OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL-TIME EMPLOYMENT. WE HOLD A MONTHLY MEETING FOR OUR MEMBERS. MEMBERS SHARE LEARNING EXPERIENCES IN A WIDE RANGE OF INTEREST GROUPS TO PURSUE LEARNING NOT FOR QUALIFICATION BUT FOR FUN

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25,013
Total expenditure: £25,743

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KAY FRANCES HUMPHREYS Chair 19 March 2018
None on record
Shani Jean Kingsland Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
John Marshall Anderson Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Dawn Artley Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Sylvia Millin Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Roger Summers Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Alan Bailey Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Barbara Goldsmith Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Julia Harris Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record
Lynne Christine White Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.55k £14.94k £4.72k £23.06k £25.01k
Total expenditure £36.78k £9.73k £5.79k £22.54k £25.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 Silver Point Marine
Point Road
CANVEY ISLAND
Essex
SS8 7TN
Phone:
07971 025925