TILFORD BACH SOCIETY (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim is to advance the education of the general public in the appreciation and understanding of music and its history with special emphasis on the music of JS Bach. The Society runs regular concerts in Farnham and Godalming and educational activities in schools. Farnham Sinfonia became part of the Society in 2018 but became a separate charity in 2022.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 April 2017: CIO registration
- Farnham Sinfonia (Working name)
- TBS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REGINALD JOHN HORROCKS | Chair | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Amanda Denbigh | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROGER JOHN JUDE | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE CACCIOTTOLO | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Trevor Alan Gray | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGUERITE SAGUN | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.33k | £63.59k | £39.43k | £33.75k | £54.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.11k | £51.28k | £36.14k | £46.62k | £55.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC AND ITS HISTORY WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON THE MUSIC OF JOHANN SEBASTIAN BACH THROUGH: - LIVE PERFORMANCES - LECTURES - CONFERENCES - COURSES - VISITS - SPONSORSHIP OF NEW COMPOSITIONS - PROVISION AND SPONSORSHIP OF TRAINING AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES FOR MUSICIANS - COOPERATION WITH OTHER MUSIC SOCIETIES - SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bethany
Chapel Lane
Pirbright
Woking
GU24 0JZ
- Phone:
- 01483474286
- Email:
- secretary@tilbach.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window