Trustees HEATH HANDS

Charity number: 1173419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Chapman Chair 19 June 2019
None on record
William Patrick LoSasso Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Susie Gorney Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Andrew John Morgan Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
John Umberto Arnoldi Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
Emily Hills Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
Jeremy Lewis Simons OBE Trustee 09 June 2022
HOUSING THE HOMELESS CENTRAL FUND
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Sarah Jane Williams Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Dr Elizabeth Mary Andrew Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Stuart Clark Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Dr Merlin Fox Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Prof Jeff Waage Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record