LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS

Charity number: 509833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 December 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 December 2020 195 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 December 2020 560 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 11 December 2020 560 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 December 2020 924 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 10 December 2020 924 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download