PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF EMMANUEL SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1172507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising funds for pupils at Emmanuel C of E Primary School in West Hampstead, London.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £62,003
Total expenditure: £41,680

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 April 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PFE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joseph Benedict Camillus Macdonald Chair 30 September 2022
None on record
Tomasz Boniek Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Kate Roscoe Bloomer Trustee 19 September 2024
NEW LONDON SINGERS
Received: On time
Jaqueline Vivien Dynowski Trustee 19 April 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.72k £10.67k £16.80k £42.82k £62.00k
Total expenditure £1.90k £12.95k £13.12k £40.52k £41.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 20 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 July 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 July 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Emmanuel C of E School
152 Mill Lane
LONDON
NW6 1TF
Phone:
02074317894