THE SOUTH CLWYD BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION (CYMDEITHAS GWENYNWRY DE CLWYD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide education, training and support for beekeepers & promote best practice in beekeeping. Support research into the best practice management of Honey Bees. Promote education in the importance of pollinating insects in the human food chain. Encourage the improvement, advancement and promotion of beekeeping. Discourage the importation and propagation of exotic subspecies of honey bee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Powys
- Wrexham
Governance
- 09 April 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glynis Knifton-Reed | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey William Critchley | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Bell | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Owen Newns | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Huw Evans | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Overmeer | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.26k | £6.20k | £7.43k | £7.57k | £9.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.85k | £7.94k | £3.92k | £7.01k | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MARCH 1975 AS AMENDED 22 MARCH 1980. as amended on 26 Mar 2018 as amended on 10 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF BEEKEEPING IN SOUTH CLWYD (THE FORMER COUNTY OF DENBIGHSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS). (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rock House
Barton Road
Barton
MALPAS
Cheshire
SY14 7HU
- Phone:
- 07779240067
- Email:
- treasurer@scbeekeepers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window