BARKING & DAGENHAM YOUTH ZONE

Charity number: 1172247
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLLR M WORBY Trustee 05 July 2018 None on record
Lubeya Pheasant Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Julia Bates Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Barry William Fletcher Trustee 15 October 2018
Headlines Craniofacial Support Charity reporting is up to date
Mark Andrew Fowler Trustee 15 October 2018 None on record
Ashfaq Ahmed Siddique Trustee 03 December 2018
THE BARKING MUSLIMS ASSOCIATION Charity reporting is 33 days late
CHARLES STUART MINDENHALL Chair 16 June 2016
MENTAL HEALTH INNOVATIONS Charity reporting is up to date
THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE Charity reporting is up to date
THE CHALCOT FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
ONSIDE YOUTH ZONES Charity reporting is up to date
MATTHEW JOSEPH RANTELL Trustee 15 October 2018
JACK PETCHEY FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Kay Trudie Andrews Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
Darryl Clark Charles Phillips Trustee 15 January 2018 None on record