Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE MACCLESFIELD ACADEMY

Charity number: 1172591
Charity reporting is overdue by 238 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2022 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 December 2019 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required