Trustees GLOUCESTER CULTURE TRUST
Charity number: 1177489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clair Elizabeth Greenway | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Mary Brady | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Belson-Read | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Heidi Taylor | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Laura Croft | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Gibbs | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steven Lewis | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mel Edwards | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
TYLER ATTWOOD | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL DENNIS HOPWOOD | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.