Accounts and annual returns BANTOU SOLUTION

Charity number: 1172330
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 6 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window