ICU SURVIVE

Charity number: 1175083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Funding for research to improve understanding of diseases relevant to intensive care and delivery of intensive care. Improving the lives of patients undergoing intensive care, psychologically and physically. Improving efficiency and working conditions for staff providing intensive care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ELIZABETH POTTER Chair 01 January 2021
None on record
Dr Benedict Creagh-Brown Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Nancileigh Doyle Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Caroline Wild Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Justin Kirk-Bayley Trustee 01 January 2021
SURREY INITIATIVE FOR TRAINING AND RESEARCH IN ULTRASOUND (SITRUS)
Received: 1 day late

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2024 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 February 2024 366 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2024 731 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2022 416 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2024 1096 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Royal Surrey County Hospital
Egerton Road
Guildford
GU2 7XX
Phone:
0796731562