THE ALMOGRAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empower the community in building stable cohesive and successful community at spiritual and social economic and cultural level away from extremist, political and ideological intolerance. Provide services and programmes and aid to the community in West London and to the public. Provide unity by its common needs, challenges and aspirations to bring understanding and harmony.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 15 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALI ELOBIED | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAHMOUD OMER | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SAMI ELKARIM | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAGZOUB ELTAYEIB HAG-ABDALLA | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31k | £2.31k | £2.54k | £433 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.45k | £5.45k | £3.02k | £2.60k | £2.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 May 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 THE RUNNING OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (THE "CENTRE") IN WEST LONDON TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND SERVICES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE; 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING FACILITIES AVAILABLE FOR PRAYER AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT ISLAM; 3.1.3 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF SEMINARS AND SUPPORT SERVICES AT THE CENTRE; 3.1.4 THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY, INCLUDING BY: (A) EDUCATING THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO ISLAMIC PRINCIPLES, IDEALS AND VALUES; AND (B) CHALLENGING EXTREMISM AND PROMOTING THE BENEFITS OF A COHESIVE, TOLERANT SOCIETY. 3.1.5 THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE SUDANESE MUSLIM COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF MINORITY COMMUNITIES, INCLUDING THE SUDANESE MUSLIM COMMUNITY, TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; (B) INCREASING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF MINORITY COMMUNITIES, INCLUDING THE SUDANESE MUSLIM COMMUNITY, TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THOSE COMMUNITIES; AND (C) PROVIDING ENGLISH LANGUAGE LESSONS AT THE CENTRE TO REDUCE SOCIAL EXCLUSION BY REASON OF LANGUAGE BARRIER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Lilestone Street
LONDON
NW8 8ST
- Phone:
- 07775716779
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window