Accounts and annual returns ALNWICK AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 509923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 21 February 2019 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 25 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required