Financial history ALNWICK AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 509923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £6.46k £6.27k £3.94k £354 £1.08k
Total expenditure £5.31k £2.24k £4.09k £1.65k £2.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A