Financial history 14TH WORKSOP (ST ANNE'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509927
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.60k £18.63k £18.88k £32.81k £22.51k
Total expenditure £11.71k £20.93k £17.75k £18.32k £19.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.89k £10.67k