OUTWOOD PRIMARY ACADEMY LOFTHOUSE GATE PTFA

Charity number: 1173435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2021 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 03 August 2018 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 August 2018 Not Required