QUESTORS YOUNG MUSICIANS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to advance the education of children and young people in music and the playing of musical instruments. To advance public education in, and appreciation of, music particularly, but not exclusively, by the running and administration of a club for young musicians in Ealing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 30 March 2017: CIO registration
- QUESTORSYOUNG MUSICIANS CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN JOSEPHINE CARR | Chair | 04 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cara Carey | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sean Cotter | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sigla Trowbridge | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Hill | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE DUBY | Trustee | 04 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marie Hardiman | Trustee | 04 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
P G MCLAUGHLIN | Trustee | 04 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.40k | £82.50k | £60.83k | £71.19k | £102.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.82k | £85.41k | £70.61k | £84.53k | £92.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN MUSIC AND THE PLAYING OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS; AND 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, MUSIC PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE RUNNING AND ADMINISTRATION OF A CLUB FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS IN EALING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Levy & Partners Ltd
7-8 Ritz Parade
LONDON
W5 3RA
- Phone:
- 020 8845 8737
- Email:
- fiona.qymc@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window