Accounts and annual returns PORTUGUESE CENTENARY APPEAL

Charity number: 1187118
Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 14 April 2025 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 07 March 2025 400 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days