CMTS (CALDICOT MUSICAL THEATRE SOCIETY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote, maintain, improve & advance education & appreciation of the arts in all forms in Caldicot & surrounding areas. Provide opportunity for all local people, without exception, to access & take part in developing in all aspects of performing arts through teaching & coaching to benefit them, the public, other organisations & charities. Produce live musical theatre to a high standard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £11,500 from 6 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 18 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Probert | Chair | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ost | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eilis Dunne | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tess Morgan | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Probert | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vera Willis | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEINI FRANCES SKINNER | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JO POSTLE | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LES MITCHELL | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDY RIGDEN | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICK SKINNER | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.00k | £6.99k | £7.36k | £12.17k | £33.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.00k | £5.04k | £11.16k | £24.31k | £26.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.50k | £2.51k | N/A | £786 | £11.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 255 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN ALL FORMS AMONG THE PEOPLE OF CALDICOT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY FOR ALL LOCAL PEOPLE, WITHOUT EXCEPTION, TO ACCESS AND TAKE PART IN DEVELOPING IN ALL ASPECTS OF PERFORMING ARTS THROUGH TEACHING AND COACHING TO BENEFIT THEM, THE PUBLIC, OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES AND TO PRODUCE LIVE MUSICAL THEATRE IN CALDICOT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
56A MAIN ROAD
PORTSKEWETT
CALDICOT
NP26 5SA
- Phone:
- 07359515610
- Email:
- cmts_info@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window