MEN'S SHED OTTERY

Charity number: 1174652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2018 On time Download