THE SIR MARTIN GILBERT LEARNING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by promoting learning for pleasure and to increase their knowledge of history, culture and community issues, to establish a library space for such activities to take place in and to make grants and awards to encourage the further advancement of education through research, lectures and works published for the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 August 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR HARRY SOLOMON | Chair | 23 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Adam Solomon KC | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lipkin | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY SOLOMON ROSENFELDER | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Jon Benjamin | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Sir Victor Blank | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.99k | £40.94k | £50.43k | £71.07k | £36.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.83k | £59.68k | £64.55k | £65.05k | £59.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING BY: (1)ARRANGING LECTURES, DISCUSSIONS, WORKSHOPS AND ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE LEARNING BY MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC FOR PLEASURE AND TO INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE OF HISTORY, CULTURE AND COMMUNITY ISSUES, AND (2)ESTABLISHING A LIBRARY SPACE FOR SUCH ACTIVITIES TO TAKE PLACE IN, AND (3)MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO STUDENTS, ACADEMICS AND INFORMAL EDUCATORS TO ENCOURAGE THE FURTHER ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THEIR RESEARCH, LECTURES AND WORKS PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLSDOWN HOUSE
32 HAMPSTEAD HIGH STREET
LONDON
NW3 1QD
- Phone:
- 0207973308805
- Email:
- info@smglc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window