Trustees THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1172830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Harry Christopher Simpson Trustee 28 October 2022
None on record
Kolawole Sheriff Ogunsakin Trustee 28 October 2022
None on record
Daniella Marley Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Mitchell Ford Laughton Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Joshua Akindele Borokinni Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Tonari Sophia Arikekpar Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Oliver Alfred James Smith Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
Charles Thomas James Gage Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Helen Cocks Trustee 30 May 2019
None on record
James Hemsley Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
DR GRAHAM SPENCER STIRLING Trustee 17 March 2017
PROVIDE DEVON
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF HOLY CROSS CHURCH NEWTON FERRERS DEVON
Received: On time
Jane Hopkinson Trustee 17 March 2017
None on record