SAWIYAN

Charity number: 1173844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 March 2019 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 March 2019 32 days late Download