Financial history UKOS ANIMAL WELFARE

Charity number: 1173585
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £844 £1.39k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A