Financial history LOVE YOUR COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1172625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £118.46k £231.74k £118.46k £117.89k £179.70k
Total expenditure £90.42k £216.91k £120.51k £120.18k £151.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £178.48k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A