ETHIOPIAN ORPHANS SUPPORT UK CHARITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Collecting funds from our regular child sponsors and channelling them to the Children's village ('orphanage') in Ethiopia. 2. Supporting the Children village with its educational and agricultural development to increase its self-reliance. Currently supporting an AVOCADO TREES GROWING PROJECT which will supplement the children's nutrition and generate cash income for the centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 04 April 2017: CIO registration
- EOS-UK CHARITY FUND (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham John Edgeley | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Jackson | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jackson | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Edgeley | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CROYDON | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE LINDA COOK | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ANN DERSO | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Elshaw | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY CHRISTINE CROYDON | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abraha Derso | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.14k | £18.73k | £19.01k | £21.80k | £15.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.61k | £17.45k | £11.18k | £17.27k | £15.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG ORPHANED, VULNERABLE AND DESTITUTE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF THE PHYSICAL CARE, EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROVISION AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO DEVELOP THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPACITIES WITH THE ULTIMATE AIM OF MAKING THEM PRODUCTIVE AND SELF-SUFFICIENT MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. THE CHARITY'S OBJECT/PURPOSE WILL BE MET BY PARTNERING WITH ELSHADAI-WUKRO CHILDREN'S VILLAGE (EWCV) IN WUKRO, TIGRAI, ETHIOPIA WHICH IS ENGAGED IN THE CARE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ORPHANED, VULNERABLE AND DESTITUTE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, AND IS PART OF ELSHADAI RELIEF & DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION, AN INDIGENOUS CHARITABLE ORGANISATION REGISTERED WITH THE ETHIOPIAN CHARITY AND SOCIETY AGENCY (ETHIOPIAN CHARITY REGISTRATION NO.0994).
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 5 The Cedars
Stockwell Road
Tettenhall
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 9AZ
- Phone:
- 07867727445
- Email:
- eosukcharityfund@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window