KERALA CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting local food bank and local community.(150 kg of food donated to the local food bank). Kerala Cultural Association actively promotes harmony between different religious and racial groups which help to reduce religious conflict,intolerance and discrimination.For example in April we celebrated Easter and Vishu festival together (Vishu is primarily celebrated by Hindus).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 06 July 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BIJU MATHEW | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANIL PUDUSSERY | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mini Suresh Babu | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rinto Rockey | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sutheesh Thomas | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Devis Pappu Pudussery | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaiju Jacob Neerathadathil | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saji Mathai | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SYJU MATHEW | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jisha Mathew | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaison Antony | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SOPHY KURIAKOSE | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Biju Mathews | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Padathiruthy Thomas | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SOCRATICE THOMAS KUDIYIRIKKAL | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.26k | £17.85k | £2.07k | £5.07k | £20.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.91k | £13.62k | £3.14k | £6.73k | £18.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 24 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING IN THE STOKE ON TRENT AND STAFFORDSHIRE AREA:- - TO RELIEVE POVERTY; - TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC’S EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF THE KERALA COMMUNITY; - TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN RACIAL GROUPS; - TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH; AND - TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN KARATE AND BADMINTON AND SUCH OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF PROMOTING HEALTHY RECREATION AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING IN THE STOKE ON TRENT AND STAFFORDSHIRE AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Pilkington Avenue
NEWCASTLE
ST5 3RA
- Phone:
- 07810524373
- Email:
- kcastoke@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window